Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1295
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1295
Title:Robert A. Rucho, et al., Appellants
v.
Common Cause, et al.
Docketed:March 14, 2018
Linked with 17A745
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:16-CV-1026, 1:16-CV-1164)
   Decision Date:January 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2018Application (17A745) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Response to application (17A745) requested by The Chief Justice, due Wednesday, January 17, by noon ET.
Jan 16 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Senator Joseph B. Scarnati, III.
Main Document
Jan 16 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by George Holding, et al.
Main Document
Jan 17 2018Response to application from respondents Common Cause, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Response to application from respondents League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Louisiana, et al.
Main Document
Jan 18 2018Reply of applicants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Application (17A745) referred to the Court.
Jan 18 2018Application (17A745) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina, case Nos. 1:16-CV-1026 and 1:16-CV-1164, entered January 9, 2018, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal in this Court. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application for stay.
Jan 23 2018Motion to construe the application for a stay as a jurisdictional statement and for expedited briefing and oral argument schedule filed by appellees Common Cause, et al. and League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 06 2018The motion of appellees to construe the application for a stay as a jurisdictional statement and for an expedited briefing and oral argument schedule is denied. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would grant the motion.
Mar 12 2018Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due April 13, 2018)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2018 to April 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2018, for all appellees.
Apr 27 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees Common Cause, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 15 2018Reply of appellants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2018Supplemental brief of appellees Common Cause, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 19 2018Second supplemental brief of appellees Common Cause, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 20 2018Supplemental brief of appellees League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 20 2018Supplemental brief of appellants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2018The judgment is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina for further consideration in light of Gill v. Whitford, 585 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Robert A. Rucho, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Emmet J Bondurant II
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

bondurant@bmelaw.com
404-881-4100
Party name: Common Cause, et al.
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543