Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1293
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1293
Title:Sonoko Tagami, Petitioner
v.
City of Chicago, Illinois
Docketed:March 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1441)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2018Waiver of right of respondent City of Chicago to respond filed.
Mar 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joel Alan Flaxman
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Kenneth N. Flaxman P.C.
200 S Michigan Ave, Ste 201
Chicago, IL 60604

jaf@kenlaw.com
3124273200
Party name: Sonoko Tagami
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathon D. Byrer
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago
30 North LaSalle St., Room 800
Chicago, IL 60602

Jonathon.Byrer@cityofchicago.org
312-742-4961
Party name: City of Chicago

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543