Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-129
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-129
Title:M. C., Petitioner
v.
C. M.
Docketed:July 26, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B270525)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 12, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 25, 2017)
Aug 14 2017Waiver of right of respondent C. M. to respond filed.
Aug 24 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 15 Feminist Academics and Advocates.
Aug 25 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al.
Aug 25 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American College of Pediatricians, et al.
Aug 25 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Concerned United Birthparents, Inc.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 21 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner M. C. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 02 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Concerned United Birthparents, Inc. GRANTED.
Oct 02 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American College of Pediatricians, et al. GRANTED.
Oct 02 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. GRANTED.
Oct 02 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 15 Feminist Academics and Advocates GRANTED.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Harold J. Cassidy
    Counsel of Record
The Cassidy Law Firm
750 Broad Street
Shrewsbury, NJ 07702

hjc@thecassidylawfirm.com
732-747-3999
Party name: M. C.
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert R. Walmsey
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 552
Los Olivos, CA 93441

Robert@jarrettewalmsley.com
805-697-7390
Party name: C. M.
Other
Thomas Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
19 South LaSalle Street, Suite 603
Chicago, IL 60603

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
(312) 782-1680
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al.
Tracy Sue Carlin
    Counsel of Record
Brannock & Humphries
1111 W. Cass Street
Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33606

tcarlin@bhappeals.com
(813)-223-4300
Party name: Concerned United Birthparents, Inc.
Michael P. Laffey
    Counsel of Record
Messina Law Firm
961 Holmdel Road
Holmdel, NJ 07733

mlaffey@messinalawfirm.com
(732) 332-9300
Party name: 15 Feminist Academics and Advocates
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel, PO Box 540774
Second Floor
Orlando, FL 32854

(407)-875-1776
Party name: American College of Pediatricians, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543