Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1285
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1285
Title:Association des Eleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Quebec, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California
Docketed:March 13, 2018
Linked with 17A793
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55192)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2018Application (17A793) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 7, 2018 to March 9, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 26 2018Application (17A793) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until March 9, 2018.
Mar 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Association des Éleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Québec, et al..
Blanket Consent
Mar 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2018
Apr 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Republic of France filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of Conseil de la Transformation Alimentaire du Québec filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Poultry & Egg Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2018Brief amici curiae of Reason Foundation and The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Missouri and 10 other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2018Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 05 2018Reply of petitioners Association des Éleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Québec, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
The Office of Michael Tenenbaum, Esq.
1431 Ocean Avenue, Ste. 400
Santa Monica, CA 90401-2136

mt@post.harvard.edu
424-246-8685
Party name: Association des Éleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Québec, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Capital Appellate Advocacy PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
202-729-6337
Party name: Republic of France
Michael Lee Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Statecraft PLLC
620 N. Tejon St.
Suite 101
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

michael@statecraftlaw.com
719-399-0890
Party name: U.S. Poultry & Egg Association
Baylen Jamie Linnekin
    Counsel of Record
1850 N. 34th St.
#141
Seattle, WA 98103

baylen.linnekin@gmail.com
202-415-8148
Party name: Reason Foundation and The Cato Institute
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: State of Missouri and 10 other States
Daniel E. Sobelsohn
    Counsel of Record
THE SOBELSOHN LAW FIRM
16027 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 608
Encino, CA 91436

dsobelsohn@sobelsohnlaw.com
310-775-0504
Party name: Conseil de la Transformation Alimentaire du Québec

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543