Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1272
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1272
Title:Henry Schein, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Docketed:March 12, 2018
Linked with 17A859
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41674)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2018Application (17A859) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2018Response to application (17A859) requested by Justice Alito, due Wednesday, February 21, by 3 p.m. ET.
Feb 21 2018Response to application from respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Reply of applicant Henry Schein, Inc., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Application (17A859) referred to the Court.
Mar 02 2018The application (17A859) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, case No. 2:12-cv-572, are stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.
Mar 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2018 to May 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2018.
May 11 2018Brief of respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
May 29 2018Reply of petitioners Henry Schein, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 02 2018Joint motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 13 2018Joint motion to extend the time to file opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 14, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 18, 2018.
Jul 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Henry Schein, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Aug 03 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Archer and White Sales, Inc..
Blanket Consent
Aug 14 2018Brief of petitioner Henry Schein, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Motion to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioners Henry Schein, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 15 2018Amicus brief of Anthony Michael Sabino not accepted for filing. (August 20, 2018 - to be resubmitted with complete documentation.)
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 29, 2018
Aug 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 18 2018Brief of respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Amicus brief of George A. Bermann not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief submitted - October 03, 2018)
Sep 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of George A. Bermann filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 01 2018Motion to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED.
Oct 15 2018Reply of petitioners Henry Schein, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Argued. For petitioners: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Daniel L. Geyser, Dallas, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Henry Schein, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lewis T. LeClair
    Counsel of Record
McKool Smith
300 Cresent Court
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
214-978-4000
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Other
Martin Sander Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
914.472.2356
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
8577727620
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Anthony Michael Sabino
    Counsel of Record
Sabino & Sabino, P.C.
92 Willis Avenue, 2nd Floor
Mineola, NY 11501

Anthony.Sabino@sabinolaw.com
516-294-3199
Party name: Anthony Michael Sabino
Jack Samuel Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Bluhm Legal Clinic - Complex Civil Litigation and Investor Protection Center
Northwestern Pritzker School of Law
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 06011

s-tenenbaum@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-4808
Party name: George A. Bermann
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: American Association for Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543