Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1268
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1268
Title:Monicah Okoba Opati, In Her Own Right, and as Executrix of the Estate of Caroline Setla Opati, Deceased, et al., Petitioners
v.
Republic of Sudan, et al.
Docketed:March 9, 2018
Linked with 17A680
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-7124, 14-7125, 14-7127, 14-7128)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2017Application (17A680) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2018 to March 2, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Application (17A680) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 2, 2018.
Mar 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 09 2018Brief of respondents Republic of Sudan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2018Reply of petitioners Monicah Okoba Opati, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Supplemental brief of respondents Republic of Sudan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jul 26 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 02 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 17, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 22, 2019.
Sep 17 2019Brief of petitioners Monicah Okoba Opati, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: Monicah Okoba Opati, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher M. Curran
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

ccurran@whitecase.com
202- 626 -3600
Party name: Republic of Sudan, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543