Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1246
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1246
Title:Whirlpool Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Homeland Housewares, LLC
Docketed:March 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1511)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2018Waiver of right of respondent Homeland Housewares, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Mar 27 2018Response Requested. (Due April 26, 2018)
Apr 26 2018Brief of respondent Homeland Housewares, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Robert Matsui
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bmatsui@mofo.com
202-887-8784
Party name: Whirlpool Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
R. Joseph Trojan
    Counsel of Record
Trojan Law Offices
9250 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 325
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

trojan@trojanlawoffices.com
3107778399
Party name: Homeland Housewares, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543