Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1245
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1245
Title:Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation, Petitioner
v.
David Cassirer, et al.
Docketed:March 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55550, 15-55977)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 5, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2018Brief of respondents David Cassirer, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Comunidad Judía De Madrid and Federación De Comunidades Judías De España in support of respondents.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2018Reply of petitioner Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Comunidad Judía De Madrid and Federación De Comunidades Judías De España GRANTED.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Erickson Andre
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
300 South Grand Avenue
Suite 4100
Los Angeles, CA 90071

sandre@nixonpeabody.com
213-629-6076
Party name: Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation
Attorneys for Respondents
David Boies
    Counsel of Record
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
333 Main Street
Armonk, NY 10504

dboies@bsfllp.com
(914) 749-8200
Party name: David Cassirer, et al.
Other
Bernardo Maria Cremades Roman
    Counsel of Record
B. Cremades Y Asociados, S.L.
CALLE GOYA 18 (FLOOR 2)
MADRID (SPAIN), XX 28001

bcr@bcremades.com
+34914237200
Party name: Comunidad Judía De Madrid and Federación De Comunidades Judías De España

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543