Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1237
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1237
Title:Osage Wind, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Osage Minerals Council
Docketed:March 6, 2018
Linked with 17A690
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-5121, 16-5022)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2017Application (17A690) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2018 to March 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Dec 28 2017Application (17A690) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 2, 2018.
Mar 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Osage County Farm Bureau, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2018Brief of respondent Osage Minerals Council in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Wind Energy Association.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 19 2018Response to motion from respondent Osage Minerals Council filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 23 2018Reply of petitioners Osage Wind, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Dec 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Supplemental brief of petitioners Osage Wind, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Wind Energy Association GRANTED.
Jan 07 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Osage County Farm Bureau, Inc., et al. GRANTED.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Osage Wind, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Scott Rasmussen
    Counsel of Record
Fredericks Peebles & Morgan LLP
1900 Plaza Drive
Louisville, CO 80027

jrasmussen@ndnlaw.com
303-673-9600
Party name: Osage Minerals Council
Other
Steven Wayne Bugg
    Counsel of Record
McAfee & Taft
10th Floor, Two Leadership Sq.
211 N. Robinson
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

steven.bugg@mcafeetaft.com
405-552-2216
Party name: Osage County Farm Bureau, Inc., et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Eugene Grace
    Counsel of Record
American Wind Energy Association
1501 M Street
Washington, DC 20005

ggrace@awea.org
202-383-2500
Party name: American Wind Energy Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543