Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1236
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1236
Title:Republic of Sudan, et al., Petitioners
v.
James Owens, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2018
Linked with 17A667
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-5105)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2017Application (17A667) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2018 to March 2, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Dec 22 2017Application (17A667) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 2, 2018.
Mar 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018.
Apr 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Terrorism and Evidence Experts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Former U.S. Ambassadors.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2018Brief of respondents James Owens, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
May 22 2018Reply of petitioner Republic of Sudan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Supplemental brief of petitioners Republic of Sudan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christopher M. Curran
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

ccurran@whitecase.com
202 626 3643
Party name: Republic of Sudan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: James Owens, et al.
Other
Paul F. Enzinna
    Counsel of Record
Ellerman Enzinna PLLC
1050 30th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20007

penzinna@ellermanenzinna.com
202-753-5553
Party name: Former U.S. Ambassadors
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: UNITED STATES
Dwight A. Healy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th floor
New York, NY 10019

dhealy@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Terrorism and Evidence Experts

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543