Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1227
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1227
Title:Align Corporation Limited, Petitioner
v.
Allister Mark Boustred, et al.
Docketed:March 2, 2018
Linked with 17A814
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(16SC448)
   Decision Date:November 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2018Application (17A814) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2018 to February 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Application (17A814) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 28, 2018.
Feb 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2018 to May 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2018, for all respondents.
Apr 02 2018Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2018Brief of respondent Allister Mark Boustred in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 02 2018Brief of respondent Horizon Hobby, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2018Reply of petitioner Align Corporation Limited filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Desmond Domenico
    Counsel of Record
Kittredge LLC
14143 Denver West Parkway
Suite 100
Golden, CO 80401

Ddomenico@kittredgellc.com
7204601432
Party name: Align Corporation Limited
Attorneys for Respondents
Conor Patrick Boyle
    Counsel of Record
Hall & Evans, LLC
1001 17th Street, Suite 300
Denver, CO 80202

boylec@hallevans.com
303-628-3300
Party name: Horizon Hobby, Inc.
Leslie Agnes Brueckner
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
475 14th Street
Suite 610
Oakland, CA 94612

lbrueckner@publicjustice.net
5106228205
Party name: Allister Mark Boustred
Other
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543