Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1198
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1198
Title:Martins Beach 1, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Surfrider Foundation
Docketed:February 26, 2018
Linked with 17A735
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A144268, A145176)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 25, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2018Application (17A735) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2019 to February 22, 2019, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Application (17A735) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 22, 2018.
Feb 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Martins Beach 1, LLC and Martins Beach 2, LLC.
Blanket Consent
Mar 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of California Business Properties Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and Western Manufactured Housing Communities Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Brief amici curiae of California Association of Realtors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 12 2018Response Requested. (Due May 14, 2018)
Apr 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2018 to June 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 13, 2018.
Jun 13 2018Brief of respondent Surfrider Foundation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 27 2018Reply of petitioners Martins Beach 1, LLC and Martins Beach 2, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Martins Beach 1, LLC and Martins Beach 2, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose@calapplaw.com
415-649-6700
Party name: Surfrider Foundation
Other
June Babiracki Barlow
    Counsel of Record
California Assoc. of Realtor
525 S. Virgil Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90020

juneb@car.org
213-739-8277
Party name: California Association of Realtors
Kenneth B. Bley
    Counsel of Record
Cox Castle & Nicholson LLP
2029 Century Park East, Suite 2100
Los Angeles, CA 90067

kbley@coxcastle.com
(310) 284-2231
Party name: California Business Properties Association
Renee Denise Flaherty
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rflaherty@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
10940 NE 33rd Place, Suite 210
Bellevue, WA 98004

bth@pacificlegal.org
425-576-0484
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543