Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-118
RSS Feed Print
No. 17-118
Vide 17-133
Title:Alaska, et al., Petitioners
v.
Wilbur L. Ross, Secretary of Commerce, et al.
Docketed:July 21, 2017
Linked with 16A1105
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-35806, 14-35811)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 11 2017Application (16A1105) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2017 to July 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
May 12 2017Application (16A1105) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 22, 2017.
Jul 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2017)
Aug 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 20, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 27, 2017, for all respondents.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Resource Development Council for Alaska, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Wyoming, et al. filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Alaska Federation of Natives filed.
Sep 22 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 27, 2017, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ec@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Alaska, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilbur L. Ross, Secretary of Commerce, et al.
Kassia Rhoades Siegel
    Counsel of Record
1212 Broadway, Ste. 800
Oakland, CA 94612

ksiegel@biologicaldiversity.org
(510) 844-7100
Party name: Center for Biological Diversity
Other
Matthew Todd Findley
    Counsel of Record
Ashburn & Mason, P.C.
1227 W. Ninth Avenue, Suite 200
Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

matt@anchorlaw.com
(907)-276-4331
Party name: Resource Development Council for Alaska, Inc., et al.
Erik Edward Petersen
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Wyoming Attorney General
2320 Capitol Avenue
Cheyenne, WY 82002

erik.petersen@wyo.gov
307-777-6946
Party name: Wyoming, et al.
Steven T. Seward
    Counsel of Record
Ascent Law Partners, LLP
719 Second Avenue
Seattle, WA 98104

steve@ascentllp.com
206-920-4129
Party name: Alaska Federation of Natives

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543