Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1176
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1176
Title:Heath Rankin, Petitioner
v.
Christian Longoria, et al.
Docketed:February 22, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15606)
   Decision Date:October 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018.
Apr 25 2018Brief of respondents Christian Longoria, et al in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2018Reply of petitioner Heath Rankin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas D. Acedo
    Counsel of Record
Struck Love Bojanowski & Acedo, PLC
3100 West Ray Road
Suite 300
Chandler, AZ 85226

nacedo@strucklove.com
480-420-1600
Party name: Heath Rankin
Attorneys for Respondents
Joel B. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Robbins & Curtin, P.L.L.C.
301 East Bethany Home Road
Suite B-100
Phoenix, AZ 85012

joel@robbinsandcurtin.com
(602)-285-0100
Party name: Christian Longoria, et al

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543