Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1168
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1168
Title:Mark Long, et al., Petitioners
v.
South Dakota
Docketed:February 21, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of South Dakota
   Case Numbers:(27381)
   Decision Date:November 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondent State of South Dakota in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Vernon Meierhenry
    Counsel of Record
Meierhenry Sargent
315 South Phillips Avenue
Sioux Falls, SD 57104

mark@meierhenrylaw.com
605-336-3075
Party name: Mark Long, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gary P. Thimsen
    Counsel of Record
Woods, Fuller, et al.
300 South Phillips Avenue
Suite 300, P. O. Box 5027
Sioux Falls, SD 57117-5027

gary.thimsen@woodsfuller.com
(605) 336-3890
Party name: State of South Dakota

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543