Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1153
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1153
Title:Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:February 16, 2018
Linked with 17A634
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15799)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2017Application (17A634) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2018 to February 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main Document
Dec 13 2017Application (17A634) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 14, 2018.
Feb 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Mar 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2018 to April 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 18, 2018.
Mar 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Michael Cole, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Forest Owners, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Brief amici curiae of the Attorneys General of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2018 to May 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 18, 2018.
May 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2018 to May 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 22, 2018.
May 22 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 04 2018Reply of petitioners Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: National Association of Forest Owners, et al.
Michael E. Haglund
    Counsel of Record
Haglund Kelley LLP
200 SW Market Street, Suite 1777
Portland, OR 97201

mhaglund@hk-law.com
503-225-0777
Party name: Michael Cole, et al.
Oramel Horace Skinner
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

o.h.skinner@azag.gov
602-542-3725
Party name: the Attorneys General of Arizona, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543