Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1149
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1149
Title:United States, ex rel. Joshua Harman, Petitioner
v.
Trinity Industries, Inc., et al.
Docketed:February 16, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-41172)
   Decision Date:September 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 14, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States of America, ex rel., Joshua Harman
Blanket Consent
Mar 06 2018Waiver of right of respondents Trinity Industries, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of H. Morgan Griffith filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 03 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner United States of America, ex rel., Joshua Harman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
George Fortune Carpinello
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
30 South Pearl Street
Albany, NY 12207

gcarpinello@bsfllp.com
(518) 434-0600
Party name: United States of America, ex rel., Joshua Harman
Attorneys for Respondents
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: Trinity Industries, Inc., et al.
Other
Eddie Travis Ramey
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
420 North 20th Street, Wells Fargo Tower, Suite 3400
Birmingham, AL 35203

tramey@burr.com
2054585489
Party name: H. Morgan Griffith

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543