Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1111
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1111
Title:J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Gerardo Ortega, et al.
Docketed:February 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-56034)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 7, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2018 to April 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 9, 2018.
Mar 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of Truck Renting and Leasing Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Penske Logistics LLC and Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief amici curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc., and 22 State Trucking Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of BNSF Railway Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Trucking Industry Defense Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Ryder System, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief amici curiae of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2018 to May 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2018Response to motion from petitioner J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Mar 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2018.
May 01 2018Brief of respondents Gerardo Ortega, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 15 2018Reply of petitioner J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
1801 K Street, N.W
Suite 411
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4503
Party name: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Gerardo Ortega, et al.
Other
Raymond A. Cardozo
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
101 Second Street, Suite 1800
San Francisco, CA 94105

rcardozo@reedsmith.com
415-543-8700
Party name: Ryder System, Inc.
James H. Hanson
    Counsel of Record
Scopelitis, Garvin, et al.
10 W. Market Street
Suite 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204

jhanson@scopelitis.com
317-637-1777
Party name: Penske Logistics LLC and Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Donald James Munro
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

dmunro@jonesday.com
2028793939
Party name: BNSF Railway Company
Richard Pianka
    Counsel of Record
ATA Litigation Center
950 North Glebe Road, Suite 210
Suite 210
Arlington, VA 22203

rpianka@trucking.org
703 838-1889
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc., and 22 State Trucking Associations
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.salmons@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Truck Renting and Leasing Association
Zachary Michael Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Koeller, Nebeker, Carlson & Haluck, LLP
3 Park Plaza, Suite 1500
Irvine, CA 92614

zachary.schwartz@knchlaw.com
9498643400
Party name: Trucking Industry Defense Association
Collin O'Connor Udell
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Lewis P.C.
90 State House Square, 8th Floor
Hartford, CT 06103-3708

collin.udell@jacksonlewis.com
8605220404
Party name: the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543