Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1108
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1108
Title:Medical Device Business Services, Inc., fka DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, ex rel. Antoni Nargol and David Langton, et al.
Docketed:February 7, 2018
Linked with 17A628
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1442)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2017Application (17A628) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2017 to February 5, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main Document
Dec 12 2017Application (17A628) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until February 5, 2018.
Feb 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Medical Device Business Services, Inc., fka DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Mar 07 2018Brief amici curiae of Coalition for Government Procurement, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief of respondents United States ex rel. Antoni Nargol and David Langton, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Reply of petitioners Medical Device Business Services, Inc., fka DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Medical Device Business Services, Inc., fka DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
W. Mark Lanier
    Counsel of Record
Lanier Law Firm
6810 FM 1960 Rd. West
Houston, TX 77069-3804

wml@lanierlawfirm.com
713-659-5200
Party name: United States ex rel. Antoni Nargol and David Langton, et al.
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Capital Appellate Advocacy PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
202-729-6337
Party name: Coalition for Government Procurement, et al.
David William Ogden
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

david.ogden@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543