Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-108
RSS Feed Print
No. 17-108
Title:Arlene's Flowers, Inc., dba Arlene's Flowers and Gifts, et al., Petitioners
v.
Washington, et al.
Docketed:July 21, 2017
Linked with 16A961
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(91615-2)
   Decision Date:February 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2017Application (16A961) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 17, 2017 to July 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 11 2017Application (16A961) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 16, 2017.
Jul 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2017)
Jul 21 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jul 28 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Washington on 08/11/2017
Aug 03 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Curt Freed, et al. on 07/25/2017.
Aug 04 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 20, 2017.
Aug 15 2017Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of North Carolina Values Coalition and the Family Research Council filed.
Aug 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund For Religious Liberty filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of The Washington State Catholic Conference, et al. filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of International Christian Photographers, et al. filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of Legal Scholar Adam J. MacLeod filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of The Restoring Religious Freedom Project filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Representatives filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Thomas More Society filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kristen K. Waggoner
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

kwaggoner@ADFlegal.org
(480) 444-0020
Party name: Arlene's Flowers, Inc., dba Arlene's Flowers and Gifts, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-2536
Party name: Washington
Michael Ramsey Scott
    Counsel of Record
Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson, P.S.
999 Third Avenue, Suite 4600
Seattle, WA 98104

michael.scott@hcmp.com
206-623-1745
Party name: Curt Freed, et al.
Other
R. Wayne Bond
    Counsel of Record
Taylor English Duma, LLP
1600 Parkwood Circle, Suite 200
Atlanta, GA 30339

wbond@taylorenglish.com
678-336-7290
Party name: The Restoring Religious Freedom Project
Thomas Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
19 South LaSalle Street, Suite 603
Chicago, IL 60603

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
(312) 782-1680
Party name: The Thomas More Society
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
9339 Cherry Valley Ave. SE, Suite 78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
616-450-4235
Party name: The Washington State Catholic Conference, et al.
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman Univ.
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584-9674

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
(910)-326-4554
Party name: North Carolina Values Coalition and the Family Council
John Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
334-262-1245
Party name: The Foundation for Moral Law
Michael Lee Francisco
    Counsel of Record
MRD Law
620 N. Tejon Street, Suite 101
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

michael.francisco@mrd.law
303-325-7843
Party name: International Christian Photographers, et al.
Scott A Keller
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

skeller@yettercoleman.com
512-936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
(202)-955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund For Religious Liberty
Gene C. Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Duncan LLP
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
202-787-1060
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

(202)-842-0200
Party name: The Cato Institute, et al.
Robert H. Tyler
    Counsel of Record
24910 Las Brisas Road
Suite 109
Murrieta, CA 92562

rtyler@tylerbursch.com
(951)-304-7583
Party name: Legal Scholar Adam J. MacLeod

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543