Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1065
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1065
Title:Jeena Lee-Walker, Petitioner
v.
New York City Department of Education, et al.
Docketed:January 29, 2018
Linked with 17A603
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4164)
   Decision Date:October 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 29 2017Application (17A603) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2018 to February 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
OtherMain DocumentMain DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 06 2017Application (17A603) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 15, 2018.
Jan 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2018)
OtherPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2018Waiver of right of respondents NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUC., et al. to respond filed.
Feb 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Antollino
    Counsel of Record
Gregory Antollino, Attorney at Law
275 Seventh Avenue
Suite 705
New York, NY 10001

gregory10011@icloud.com
2123347397
Party name: Jeena Lee-Walker
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan A. Popolow
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

jpopolow@law.nyc.gov
(212) 356-4084
Party name: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUC., et al.
Other
Sarah M. Shalf
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
Gambrell Hall
1301 Clifton Road NE
Atlanta, GA 30322-2770

sarah.shalf@emory.edu
404-712-4652
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543