Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1059
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1059
Title:Max Julian Wright, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 29, 2018
Linked with 17A510
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3292)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2017Application (17A510) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 6, 2017 to November 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Nov 08 2017Application (17A510) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until November 13, 2017.
Nov 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2018)
PetitionOtherProof of ServiceOther
Feb 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2018 to March 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 30, 2018.
Mar 29 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Apr 18 2018Reply of petitioner Max Julian Wright filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Beau B. Brindley
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Beau B. Brindley
53 W. Jackson Blvd.
Suite 1410
Chicago, IL 60604

bbbrindley@brindleylaw.com
3127658878
Party name: Max Julian Wright
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543