Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1056
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1056
Title:Quality Systems, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust, et al.
Docketed:January 26, 2018
Linked with 17A601
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55173)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 29, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2017Application (17A601) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 28, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 05 2017Application (17A601) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 26, 2018.
Jan 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2018Waiver of right of respondent City of Miami Fire Fighters’ and Police Officers’ Retirement Trust, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Quality Systems, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 14 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of Miami Fire Fighters’ and Police Officers’ Retirement Trust, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 20 2018Response Requested. (Due March 22, 2018)
Mar 22 2018Brief of respondents City of Miami Fire Fighters’ and Police Officers’ Retirement Trust, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2018Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Reply of petitioners Quality Systems, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 11 2018Letter of May 11, 2018 from counsel for petitioners received. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 08 2018Letter of June 8, 2018 from counsel for petitioners received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Sep 14 2018Letter of September 14, 2018 from counsel for petitioners received.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004-1304

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Quality Systems, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph D. Daley
    Counsel of Record
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
655 West Broadway
Suite 1900
San Diego, CA 92101

jdaley@rgrdlaw.com
619-231-1058
Party name: City of Miami Fire Fighters’ and Police Officers’ Retirement Trust, et al.
Other
Douglas Wesley Greene
    Counsel of Record
Baker Hostetler LLP
999 3rd Avenue
Suite 3600
Seattle, WA 98104

dgreene@bakerlaw.com
206-566-7090
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Lewis Jeffrey Liman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

lliman@cgsh.com
212-225-2000
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543