Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1042
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1042
Title:BNSF Railway Company, Petitioner
v.
Michael D. Loos
Docketed:January 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3355, 16-1123)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 06 2018Waiver of right of respondent Michael Loos to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 21 2018Response Requested. (Due March 23, 2018)
Feb 26 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Association of American Railroads.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondent Michael Loos in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Reply of petitioner BNSF Railway Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Association of American Railroads GRANTED.
May 14 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jun 05 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 20, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 10, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Charles Glaston Cole
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson, LLP
1330 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

ccole@steptoe.com
202-429-6720
Party name: BNSF Railway Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Armin Wolff
    Counsel of Record
Schlichter Bogard & Denton LLP
100 South Street
Suite 1200
Saint Louis, MO 63102

mwolff@uselaws.com
3146216115
Party name: Michael Loos
Other
Daniel Saphire
    Counsel of Record
Association of Amer. Railroads
425 3rd Street. N.W.
Washington, DC 20024

dsaphire@aar.org
202-639-2505
Party name: Association of American Railroads

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543