Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1009
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1009
Title:Constitution Pipeline Company, LLC, Petitioner
v.
New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, et al.
Docketed:January 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1568)
   Decision Date:August 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 19, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2018 to March 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 22, 2018, for all respondents.
Feb 20 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2018Brief of respondents New York State Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2018Brief of intervenors respondents Catskill Mountainkeeper, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2018Reply of petitioner Constitution Pipeline Company, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John F. Stoviak
    Counsel of Record
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
1500 Market Street. 38th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102

john.stoviak@saul.com
215-972-1095
Party name: Constitution Pipeline Company, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Deborah Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
48 Wall Street
19th Floor
New York, NY 10005

dgoldberg@earthjustice.org
212-845-7377
Party name: Catskill Mountainkeeper, Inc., et al.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway
New York, NY 10271-0332

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8020
Party name: New York State Respondents
Other
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8000
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543