SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1006
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1006
Title:
Robert C. Laity, Petitioner
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:
January 19, 2018
Lower Ct:
Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Third Judicial Department
Case Numbers:
(524197)
Decision Date:
August 10, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
November 21, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 23 2018
Waiver of right of respondent State of New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 06 2018
Waiver of right of respondent Senator Rafael "Ted" Cruz to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 28 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018
Petition DENIED.
Apr 06 2018
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 11 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert C. Laity
43 Mosher Drive
Tonawanda, NY 14150-5217
Party name: Robert Laity
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey W. Lang
Counsel of Record
The Capitol
Albany, NY 12224
jlang@ag.ny.gov
518-776-2027
Party name: State of New York
Daniel Martin Sullivan
Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10024
dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Senator Rafael "Ted" Cruz
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##