Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1005
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1005
Title:Oath Holdings, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Marianne Ajemian, et al.
Docketed:January 19, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SJC-12237)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2018Brief of respondents Marianne Ajemian, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Facebook, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2018Reply of petitioner Oath Holdings, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Facebook, Inc., et al. GRANTED.
Mar 26 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marc J. Zwillinger
    Counsel of Record
ZwillGen PLLC
1900 M Street NW
Suite 250
Washington, DC 20036

marc@zwillgen.com
202-296-3585
Party name: Oath Holdings, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert L. Kirby Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Pierce & Mandell, P.C.
11 Beacon Street
Suite 800
Boston, MA 02109

rkirby@piercemandell.com
6177202444
Party name: Marianne Ajemian, et al.
Other
John Randall Tyler
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Ave, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98102

rtyler@perkinscoie.com
2063593034
Party name: Facebook, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543