Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1001
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1001
Title:Raymond Severson, Petitioner
v.
Heartland Woodcraft, Inc.
Docketed:January 18, 2018
Linked with 17A627
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3754)
   Decision Date:September 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2017Application (17A627) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 19, 2017 to January 18, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 11 2017Application (17A627) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 18, 2018.
Jan 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2018Brief of respondent Heartland Woodcraft, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 05 2018Reply of petitioner Raymond Severson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James A. Walcheske
    Counsel of Record
Walcheske & Luzi
15850 W. Bluemound Road
Suite 304
Brookfield, WI 53005

jwalcheske@walcheskeluzi.com
(262) 780-1953
Party name: Raymond Severson
Sarah Marie KonskySupreme Court and Appellate Clinic
The University of Chicago Law School
1111 E. 60th St.
Chicago, IL 60637

konsky@uchicago.edu
773-834-3190
Party name: Raymond Severson
Attorneys for Respondent
David Albert McClurg
    Counsel of Record
Petrie + Pettit, S.C.
250 East Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 1000
Milwaukee, WI 53202

dmcclurg@petriepettit.com
414-276-2850
Party name: Heartland Woodcraft, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543