Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1
Title:Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Daniel Norcia
Docketed:June 27, 2017
Linked with 16A1109
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-16994)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2017Application (16A1109) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 28, 2017 to June 26, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
May 15 2017Application (16A1109) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 26, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2017)
Jul 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 25, 2017, for all respondents.
Aug 22 2017Brief of respondents Daniel Norcia, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 05 2017Reply of petitioners Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen Blake Kinnaird
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
875 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

stephenkinnaird@paulhastings.com
202-551-1842
Party name: Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Karla Ann Gilbride
    Counsel of Record
1620 L St. NW, Ste. 630
Washington, DC 20036

kgilbride@publicjustice.net
202-797-8600
Party name: Daniel Norcia, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543