Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16A1253
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16A1253
Title:Citibank, N.A., Applicant
v.
Sharon McGill
Docketed:June 21, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S224086)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2017Application (16A1253) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 5, 2017 to September 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 22 2017Application (16A1253) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 3, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julia B. Strickland
    Counsel of Record
Strook & Strook & Lavan LLP
2029 Century Park East
Suite 1600
Los Angeles, CA 90067-3086

JStrickland@strook.com
(310) 556-5800
Party name: Citibank, N.A.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543