Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-991
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-991
Title:Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, Petitioner
v.
Altin Bashkim Shuti
Docketed:February 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3835)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 15, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2017)
Mar 08 2017Waiver of right of respondent Altin Bashkim Shuti to respond filed.
Mar 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Mar 16 2017Response Requested. (Due April 17, 2017)
Apr 14 2017Brief of respondent Altin Bashkim Shuti in opposition filed.
Apr 14 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Altin Bashkim Shuti.
May 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Attorneys for Respondent
Marshal E. Hyman
    Counsel of Record
Marshal E. Hyman & Associates
3250 West Big Beaver
Suite 529
Troy, MI 48084

(248) 643-0642
Party name: Altin Bashkim Shuti
Altin B. Shuti
    Counsel of Record
29836 27 Mile Rd.
Lenox Township, MI 48048

(586) 744-0647
Party name: Altin Bashkim Shuti

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543