Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-978
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-978
Title:Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, Petitioner
v.
Carlton Baptiste
Docketed:February 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-4476)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2017)
Feb 15 2017Waiver of right of respondent Carlton Baptiste to respond filed.
Mar 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 09 2017Response Requested. (Due April 10, 2017)
Apr 06 2017Brief of respondent Carlton Baptiste in opposition filed.
Apr 25 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael L. Foreman
    Counsel of Record
Pennsylvania State University, Civil Rights Appellate Clinic
329 Innovation Blvd., Suite 118
University Park, PA 16803

mlf25@psu.edu
(814) 865-3832
Party name: Carlton Baptiste

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543