Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9660
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9660
Title:Daniel Larios-Villatoro, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-20194)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2017
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 21, 2017)
Jul 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 21, 2017.
Aug 21 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Sep 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and the petition for a writ of certiorari as to Daniel Larios-Villatoro are granted. The judgment is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018). The petition for a writ of certiorari as to Jaime A. Hernandez-Hernandez is denied.
May 31 2018Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 21 2018DISTRIBUTED.
Jul 16 2018Rehearing DENIED.
Jul 16 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael L. Herman
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Daniel Larios-Villatoro
Michael Lance Herman
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1056

Michael_Herman@fd.org
7137184600
Party name: Jaime Adrian Hernandez-Hernandez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543