Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-961
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-961
Title:Nicole A. Dalmazzi, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0651)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 6, 2017)
Feb 09 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Feb 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 22 2017Response Requested. (Due March 24, 2017)
Feb 24 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Nicole A. Dalmazzi filed.
Mar 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 24, 2017.
Apr 19 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 15, 2017.
May 15 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
May 19 2017Reply of petitioner Nicole A. Dalmazzi filed. VIDED.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition GRANTED, and the petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 16-1017 and 16-1423 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. In addition to the questions presented by the petitions, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether this Court has jurisdiction to review the cases in Nos. 16-961 and 16-1017 under 28 U. S. C. ยง 1259(3).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
(512) 475-9198
Party name: Nicole A. Dalmazzi
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543