Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9607 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9607 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Richard Rojem, Petitioner
v.
Terry Royal, Warden
Docketed:June 20, 2017
Linked with 16A967
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-6210)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 06 2017Application (16A967) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 17, 2017 to June 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Apr 12 2017Application (16A967) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 16, 2017.
Jun 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 20, 2017)
Jul 19 2017Brief of respondent Terry Royal, Warden in opposition filed.
Aug 02 2017Reply of petitioner Richard Rojem filed. (Distributed)
Aug 03 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jack Fisher
    Counsel of Record
15 N Robinson
P.O. Box 1976
Edmond, OK 73083

okfishlaw@aol.com
405-235-9466
Party name: Richard Rojem
Attorneys for Respondent
Caroline Elizabeth Jane Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Attorney General

313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Caroline.Hunt@oag.ok.gov
(405) 522-3921
Party name: Terry Royal, Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543