Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9536
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-9536
Title:Tyran M. Alexander, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(17-0188/AR)
   Decision Date:May 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 13, 2017)
Jul 07 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 14, 2017.
Aug 04 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 13, 2017.
Sep 13 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Sep 13 2017Reply of petitioner Tyran M. Alexander filed.
Sep 28 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory D. Smith
    Counsel of Record
331 Franklin Street, Suite 1
Clarksville, TN 37040

(931) 647-1299
Party name: Tyran M. Alexander
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543