Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9448 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-9448 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Quentin Marcus Truehill, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:June 6, 2017
Linked with 16A1172
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC14-1514)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2017Application (16A1172) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2017 to June 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jun 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 6, 2017)
Jun 05 2017Application (16A1172) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 13, 2017.
Jul 03 2017Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Jul 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion). Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Ginsburg and Justice Breyer join, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nancy Ryan
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Public Defender
444 Seabreeze Blvd.
Suite 210
Daytona Beach, FL 32118

(386) 254-3758
Party name: Quentin Marcus Truehill
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen D. Ake
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Attorney General
Office of Attorney General
3507 E. Frontage Rd., Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607-7013

stephen.ake@myfloridalegal.com
(813) 287-7910
Party name: Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543