Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9424
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9424
Title:Gregory Nidez Valencia, Jr., et al., Petitioners
v.
Arizona
Docketed:June 5, 2017
Linked with 16A1010
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-16-0156-PR)
   Decision Date:December 23, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 2, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2017Application (16A1010) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 3, 2017 to June 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 20 2017Application (16A1010) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 2, 2017.
May 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 5, 2017)
Jun 20 2017Waiver of right of respondent Arizona to respond filed.
Jul 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Arizona State Prisoners with pending Miller claims in Federal Court filed.
Jul 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Juvenile Law Center filed.
Jul 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 21 2017Response Requested. (Due September 20, 2017)
Sep 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 20, 2017.
Oct 19 2017Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Oct 31 2017Reply of petitioners Gregory N.Valencia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 27 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Joseph Euchner
    Counsel of Record
33 N. Stone Avenue, 21 st Fl.
Tucson, AZ 85701

david.euchner@pima.gov
520-724-6800
Party name: Gregory N.Valencia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jacob Ricks Lines
    Counsel of Record
Pima County Attorney's Office
32 North Stone Ave.
14th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701

(520)-740-5600
Party name: Arizona
Other
Keith J. HilzendegerAssistant Federal Public Defender
850 West Adams Street
Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

keith_hilzendeger@fd.org
(602) 382-2700
Party name: Arizona State Prisoners with pending Miller claims in Federal Court
Marsha L. LevickJuvenile Law Center
1315 Walnut Street
4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19107

mlevick@jlc.org
(215) 625-0551
Party name: Juvenile Law Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543