Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9319
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9319
Title:Amilcar Linares-Mazariego, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-11187)
   Decision Date:February 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 23, 2017)
Jun 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017.
Jul 24 2017Memorandum of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 15 2017Reply of petitioner Amilcar Linares-Mazariego filed. (Distributed)
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
J. Matthew Wright
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's OfficeNorthern District of Texas500 South Taylor Street, Suite 110
Amarillo, TX 79101

matthew_wright@fd.org
(806) 324-2370
Party name: Amilcar Linares-Mazariego
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543