Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9304 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9304 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Christopher Anthony Floyd, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:May 25, 2017
Linked with 16A949
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(1130527)
   Decision Date:November 18, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2017Application (16A949) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 20, 2017 to May 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Apr 07 2017Application (16A949) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 22, 2017.
May 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 26, 2017)
Jun 26 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 26, 2017.
Jul 25 2017Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed.
Aug 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 29 2017Record Requested.
Sep 21 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of Alabama. The record is electronic.
Sep 28 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 06 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Nov 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Randall S. Susskind122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

rsusskind@eji.org
(334) 269-1803
Party name: Christopher Anthony Floyd
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas R. Govan
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
P.O. Box 300152
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

tgovan@ago.state.al.us
(334)-242-7300
Party name: Alabama
Beth Jackson Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

bhughes@ago.state.al.us
334-242-7300
Party name: Alabama

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543