Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9282 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9282 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Matthew Reeves, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:May 23, 2017
Linked with 16A886
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(CR-13-1504)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 20, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2017Application (16A886) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 20, 2017 to May 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Mar 13 2017Application (16A886) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 22, 2017.
May 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 22, 2017)
Jun 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017.
Jul 24 2017Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed.
Aug 03 2017Reply of petitioner Matthew Reeves filed.
Aug 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 31 2017Record Requested.
Sep 08 2017Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama. The record is electronic.
Sep 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 29 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Nov 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Ginsburg and Justice Kagan join, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert N. Hochman
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin, LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

rhochman@sidley.com
(312)-853-7000
Party name: Matthew Reeves
Attorneys for Respondent
Beth Jackson Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

bhughes@ago.state.al.us
(334) 242-7300, 242-7392
Party name: Alabama

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543