Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-920
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-920
Title:National Restaurant Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Labor, et al.
Docketed:January 24, 2017
Linked with 16A529
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-35765)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:September 6, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2016Application (16A529) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2016 to January 19, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Nov 28 2016Application (16A529) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 19, 2017.
Jan 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 23, 2017)
Feb 15 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 27, 2017.
Feb 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Feb 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Mar 20 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 11, 2017.
May 03 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 10, 2017.
Jun 30 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 8, 2017.
Aug 01 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners National Restaurant Association, et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 7, 2017.
Nov 03 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 7, 2018.
Feb 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2018 to April 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 9, 2018.
Apr 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2018 to May 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 9, 2018.
May 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2018 to May 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 23, 2018.
May 22 2018Brief of respondents Department of Labor, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul DeCamp
    Counsel of Record
Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.
1227 25th Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20037

pdecamp@ebglaw.com
(202) 861-1819
Party name: Nat. Restaurant Assn., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Labor, et al.
Other
M. Reed HopperPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

mrh@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Ilya ShapiroCato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202) 842-2000
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543