Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-8997
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-8997
Vide 16-8777
Title:Maurice Lamont Davis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-10330)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 2, 2017)
May 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 3, 2017.
Jun 12 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 2, 2017.
Aug 01 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 18, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Sep 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brandon E. Beck
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
1205 Texas Avenue #507
Lubbock, TX 79401

(806) 472-7236
Party name: Maurice Lamont Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543