Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-8996
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-8996
Title:Brannon D. Taylor, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 4, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4192)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
May 10 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
May 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
May 30 2017Response Requested. (Due June 29, 2017)
Jun 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 31, 2017.
Jul 31 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 02 2017Reply of petitioner Brandon D.Taylor filed.
Aug 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dan Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
818 Grand, Suite 300
Kansas City, MO 64106

(816) 471-8282
Party name: Brandon D.Taylor
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543