Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-8777
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-8777
Vide 16-8997
Title:Andre Levon Glover, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 19, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-10330)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 19, 2017)
May 10 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 19, 2017.
Jun 15 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 19, 2017.
Jul 11 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 18, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Sep 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
J. Joseph MongarasSorrels, Udashen & Anton
2311 Cedar Springs
Suite 250
Dallas, TX 75201

jjm@sualaw.com
(214) 468-8100
Party name: Andre Levon Glover
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543