Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-8734
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-8734
Title:Ramiro Castaneda-Morales, aka Marco Vargas-Bustos, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-41653)
   Decision Date:January 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 17, 2017)
May 10 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 16, 2017.
Jun 08 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017.
Jul 17 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Aug 03 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Philip G. Gallagher
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

philip_gallagher@fd.org
(713) 718-4600
Party name: Ramiro Castaneda-Morales, aka Marco Vargas-Bustos
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543