Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-8675
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-8675
Title:Adalberto Aguirre-Arellano, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 11, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-40667)
   Decision Date:February 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 11, 2017)
May 03 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 12, 2017.
Jun 08 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 12, 2017.
Jul 12 2017Memorandum of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jul 21 2017Reply of petitioner Adalberto Aguirre-Arellano filed.
Jul 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathryn Shephard
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana, Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Adalberto Aguirre-Arellano
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543