Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-8616
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-8616
Title:Michael Kevin Harris, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1237)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 8, 2017)
May 04 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 7, 2017.
Jun 07 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jun 14 2017Reply of petitioner Michael Kevin Harris filed.
Jun 22 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 31 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Michael K. Harris filed. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Rescheduled.
Dec 18 2017Second supplemental brief of petitioner Michael K. Harris filed.
Main Document
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Petition DENIED.
Mar 30 2018Supplemental Brief of Michael K. Harris not accepted for filing. (May 04, 2018)
Mar 30 2018Supplemental Brief of Michael K. Harris not accepted for filing. (May 04, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Josh Lee
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
Appellate Dividion, 633 17th Street, Suite 1000
Denver, CO 80202

josh.lee@fd.org
(303) 294-7002
Party name: Michael K. Harris
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543