Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-8453
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-8453
Title:Israel Perez-Jimenez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-10135)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 24, 2017)
Apr 03 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Apr 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 12 2017Response Requested. (Due May 12, 2017)
Jun 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017.
Jul 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2017.
Aug 04 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2017.
Sep 15 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Oct 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christopher Curtis
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
819 Taylor Street, Room 9A10
Fort Worth, TX 76102

Chris_Curtis@fd.org
(817) 978-2753
Party name: Israel Perez-Jimenez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543