Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-8058
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-8058
Title:Francisco Alvaro-Velasco, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-40991)
   Decision Date:November 21, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 24, 2017)
Mar 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 24, 2017.
Apr 25 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2017.
May 18 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 23, 2017.
Jun 15 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017.
Jul 24 2017Memorandum of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jul 27 2017Reply of petitioner Francisco Alvaro-Velasco filed.
Aug 03 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott A. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Francisco Alvaro-Velasco
Scott A. Martin
    Counsel of Record
440 Louisiana, Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

scott_marting@fd.org
(713) 718-4600
Party name: FranciscoAlvaro-Velasco
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543